MD SB524 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, under certain circumstances, to include psychiatric nurse practitioners who are providing Assertive Community Treatment or mobile treatment services to certain Maryland Medical Assistance Program recipients in the types of providers eligible to receive reimbursement for health care services that are delivered through telemedicine and provided to Program recipients; terminating the Act after September 30, 2021; etc.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Telemedicine – Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners and Psychiatrists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2019-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-04-01 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-28 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {547771/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Electronic Communication
Health Care Facilities
Health, Department of
Medical Assistance
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nurses
Patients
Psychiatrists
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Video
Communications
Electronic Communication
Health Care Facilities
Health, Department of
Medical Assistance
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nurses
Patients
Psychiatrists
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Video