MD SB524 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Human Resources to serve in a fiduciary capacity for children in its custody; requiring the Department, in any action, service, or decision on behalf of a child in its custody, to protect and serve the best interest of the child; requiring the Department to take specified actions when serving as a representative payee; requiring the Department to provide specified notice to the child, through the child's attorney, of specified actions taken with respect to specified benefits for the child; etc.
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-03 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2015-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-06 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {378370/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Appeals
Attorneys
Children
Estates and Trusts
Family Law
Federal Government
Fiduciaries
Foster Care
Hearings
Human Resources, Department of
Insurance
Minors
Notices
Records
Salaries and Compensation
Social Security
Veterans
Attorneys
Children
Estates and Trusts
Family Law
Federal Government
Fiduciaries
Foster Care
Hearings
Human Resources, Department of
Insurance
Minors
Notices
Records
Salaries and Compensation
Social Security
Veterans