MD SB523 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 641
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 641
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the tax imposed on certain pass-through entities; requiring each pass-through entity to pay the tax imposed with respect to certain shares of certain nonresident and nonresident entity members of the pass-through entity; authorizing a pass-through entity to elect to pay the tax imposed with respect to certain shares of all resident members of the pass-through entity; providing for the calculation of the tax; prohibiting the tax required to be paid for any taxable year from exceeding a certain amount; etc.
Title
Income Tax – Pass–Through Entities and Corporations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 641 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-18 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (130-3) |
2020-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {895861/1 Adopted |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {769735/1 Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Business Trusts
Corporations
Income Tax
Limited Liability Companies
Nonprofit Organizations
Partnerships
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Corporations
Income Tax
Limited Liability Companies
Nonprofit Organizations
Partnerships
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 102.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 10 | 701.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 10 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |