MD SB523 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring various authorized reserve real estate investments of insurers other than life insurers to be for the accommodation of business; authorizing other reserve investments to include fee-simple or improved leasehold real estate or interests in limited partnerships formed for the development or ownership of fee-simple or leasehold real estate only under certain circumstances; prohibiting the value of certain reserve investments from exceeding certain percentages of the admitted assets of the insurer; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance - Investments of Insurers Other Than Life Insurers - Real Estate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-03-15HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2019-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-13SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-13SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-08SenateHearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
2019-03-08SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-11SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback