MD SB522 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that certain patients be advised of the benefits and risks associated with the prescription of certain opioids and benzodiazepines under certain circumstances; and providing that a violation of the Act is grounds for disciplinary action by the health occupations board that regulates the health care provider who commits the violation.
Title
Health Care Providers - Opioid and Benzodiazepine Prescriptions - Discussion of Benefits and Risks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-4) (Y: 131 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-4) (Y: 131 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (130-4) |
2018-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {426989/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {434233/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Discipline
Drugs
Health
Health Occupations
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Records
Review Boards
Discipline
Drugs
Health
Health Occupations
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Records
Review Boards