MD SB522 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the applicability of provisions of the Maryland Uniform Commercial Code governing funds transfers; providing that the provisions apply to a specified remittance transfer except under specified circumstances; and establishing that, in the event of an inconsistency between an applicable provision of the Maryland Uniform Commercial Code governing funds transfers and an applicable provision of the federal Electronic Fund Transfer Act, the federal law governs to the extent of the inconsistency.
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Funds Transfers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2014-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-03-11 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-19 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Finance |