MD SB521 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth Victims of Human Trafficking; specifying the purpose of the Workgroup; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Workgroup; prohibiting a member of the Workgroup from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; establishing the duties of the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2015; etc.
Title
Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth Victims of Human Trafficking
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2015-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-2) |
2015-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments {282513/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2015-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-18 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {978078/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
Human Rights
Reports
Safety
Social Services
Sunset
Victims
Youth
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
Human Rights
Reports
Safety
Social Services
Sunset
Victims
Youth