MD SB517 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a civil penalty for the smoking of marijuana in a public place; establishing that a specified criminal prohibition on the use or possession of drug paraphernalia does not apply to the use or possession of drug paraphernalia involving the use or possession of marijuana; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Use and Possession of Marijuana and Drug Paraphernalia

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (83-53) (Y: 83 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Shoemaker01) Rejected (63-73) (Y: 63 N: 73 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-04-05 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Carozza01) Rejected (57-78) (Y: 57 N: 78 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-04-05 - House - House Floor - Motion vote previous question (Vaughn) Adopted (86-50) (Y: 86 N: 50 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-13) (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Madaleno) {973126/1 Rejected (8-38) (Y: 8 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22SenateVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2015-04-13SenateReturned Passed
2015-04-11HouseThird Reading Passed (83-53)
2015-04-11HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (63-73)
2015-04-11HouseMotion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted
2015-04-11HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Shoemaker) {533827/1
2015-04-10HouseSecond Reading Passed
2015-04-10HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Carozza) Rejected (57-78)
2015-04-10HouseMotion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted (86-50)
2015-04-10HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Carozza) {473927/1
2015-04-10HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2015-04-10HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2015-03-31HouseHearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-03-20HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2015-03-20SenateThird Reading Passed (32-13)
2015-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2015-03-18SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {973126/1 Rejected (8-38)
2015-03-18SenateFloor Committee Amendment {318871/1 Adopted
2015-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {178278/2 Report Adopted
2015-03-17SenateLaid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
2015-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments {178278/2
2015-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2015-03-04SenateHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-02-06SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0517?ys=2015rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/sb/sb0517f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/sb/sb0517t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0517_17827802.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0517_31887101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0517_97312601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0517_47392701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0517_53382701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/fnotes/bil_0007/sb0517.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/sb0517_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/sb0517_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/veto_letters/sb0517.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0517,s-0447&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0517,s-0460&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0517,h-1015&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0517,h-1016&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0517,h-1062&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0517,h-1063&stab=02&ys=2015RS

Bill Comments

feedback