MD SB515 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. (Appropriations)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Career and Technology Education Grant Program to provide grants for the capital equipping of school facilities used to provide a certain career and technology program; requiring the Interagency Committee on School Construction to implement and administer the Program; requiring the Interagency Committee to award certain grants to county boards of education and to develop application procedures and eligibility requirements under the Program; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Career and Technology Education and Workforce Investment Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. (Appropriations)
2018-03-19HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-20HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
2018-03-09HouseFirst Reading Appropriations and Ways and Means
2018-03-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-06SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-06SenateFloor Amendment {903824/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
2018-03-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {699338/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-02-21SenateHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-29SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback