MD SB515 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Making specified provisions of law concerning the advertising for bids for procurements costing more than $25,000 applicable to construction or repair for public school projects in the State; including construction and repair projects under provisions of law concerning the award of procurement contracts, as specified; requiring the award of specified contracts to consider a plan for meeting or exceeding the State's Minority Business Enterprise goals; and applying the Act prospectively.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Boards of Education - Procurements for Construction or Repair of School Projects

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (30-16) (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Norman) {223926/1 Rejected (16-29) (Y: 16 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Pinsky) {943922/1 Rejected (19-24) (Y: 19 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Conway) {193527/1 Rejected (20-23) (Y: 20 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Jennings) {773321/2 Rejected (18-27) (Y: 18 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2016-04-09HouseHearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
2016-04-08HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2016-04-07HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2016-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (30-16)
2016-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-04-05SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Norman) {223926/1 Rejected (16-29)
2016-04-05SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {943922/1 Rejected (19-24)
2016-04-05SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Conway) {193527/1 Rejected (20-23)
2016-04-05SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {773321/2 Rejected (18-27)
2016-04-05SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Conway) Adopted
2016-04-04SenateSpecial Order until 4/5 (Senator Brochin) Adopted
2016-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2016-04-04SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2016-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments {609232/1
2016-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2016-03-17SenateHearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
2016-03-11SenateHearing cancelled
2016-03-17SenateHearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
2016-02-08SenateReassigned to Budget and Taxation
2016-02-08SenateHearing cancelled
2016-02-23SenateHearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0515&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb0515f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb0515t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0515_19352701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0515_22392601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0515_60923201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0515_77332102.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0515_94392201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0005/sb0515.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/sb0515_b&t.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/sb0515_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0515,s-0978&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0515,s-0979&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0515,s-0980&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0515,s-0981&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0515,s-0995&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments

feedback