MD SB515 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the circumstances under which specified depository institutions may conduct a savings promotion raffle; repealing a requirement that a depository institution that offers a savings promotion raffle must post in specified locations and disclose in specified materials a specified statement describing the terms and conditions of the raffle; repealing a requirement that the Commissioner of Financial Regulation must approve a savings promotion raffle conducted by a banking institution; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial Institutions - Depository Institutions - Savings Promotion Raffles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-12SenateVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2015-04-03SenateReturned Passed
2015-04-02HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2015-04-01HouseSecond Reading Passed
2015-04-01HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2015-04-01HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2015-03-11HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2015-03-10SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2015-03-06SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2015-03-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {137070/1 Report Adopted
2015-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2015-03-03SenateHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-02-06SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0515&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2015rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/sb/sb0515f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/sb/sb0515t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0515_13707001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/fnotes/bil_0005/sb0515.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/sb0515_fin.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/sb0515_ecm.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/veto_letters/sb0515.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0515,s-0308&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0515,h-0730&stab=02&ys=2015RS

Bill Comments

feedback