MD SB515 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a provision of law that prohibits a court exercising criminal jurisdiction in a case involving a child to transfer the case to the juvenile court under specified circumstances; prohibiting the court from transferring a case to juvenile court if the child was convicted in an unrelated case excluded from juvenile court jurisdiction, or the alleged crime is murder in the first degree and the accused child was 16 or 17 years of age when the alleged crime was committed; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Law - Transfer of Cases to Juvenile Court

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-46) (Y: 89 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (35-11) (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-14SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 178
2014-04-07SenateReturned Passed
2014-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (89-46)
2014-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2014-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2014-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2014-04-02HouseHearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-03-26HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2014-03-24HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2014-03-21SenateThird Reading Passed (35-11)
2014-03-20SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-03-20SenateFavorable with Amendments {198279/1 Report Adopted
2014-03-20SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2014-02-25SenateHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-01-29SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0515&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2014rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/sb/sb0515f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/sb/sb0515t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/Chapters_noln/CH_178_sb0515t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0515_19827901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/fnotes/bil_0005/sb0515.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/sb0515_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/sb0515_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0515,s-0676&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0515,h-1306&stab=02&ys=2014RS

Bill Comments

feedback