MD SB515 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that specified individuals may be eligible for services from the Office of the Public Defender without an assessment regarding the need of the individual; establishing that the determination of eligibility for services from the Office of the Public Defender based on need applies for an individual whose assets and net annual income equal or exceed a specified amount; and establishing that the courts are prohibited from appointing an attorney through the Office of the Public Defender under specified circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Defender - Representation - Income Eligibility and Appointment by a

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-10 Approved by the Governor
2011-04-06 Third Reading Passed (135-1)
2011-04-05 Second Reading Passed
2011-04-05 Favorable Report Adopted
2011-04-09 Favorable Report by Judiciary
2011-03-28 Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-03-11 First Reading Judiciary
2011-04-06 Returned Passed
2011-03-11 Third Reading Passed (44-0)
2011-03-09 Second Reading Passed
2011-03-09 Favorable Report Adopted
2011-03-08 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2011-02-09 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-02-04 First Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback