MD SB512 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Recruitment, Retention, and Promotion of Teachers in Maryland; providing for the membership, chair, and staff for the Task Force; providing that members of the Task Force may not receive specified compensation, but are entitled to specified reimbursement for specified expenses; requiring that on or before June 1, 2017, the Task Force report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study the Recruitment, Retention, and Promotion of Teachers in Maryland
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-24 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-23 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {774435/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Education, State Department of
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Sunset
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment
Education, State Department of
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Sunset
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment