MD SB512 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board to include one person who is a family member of a homicide victim.
Title
Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Membership - Family Member of Homicide Victim
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-04-07 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2014-04-05 | House | Delegates Waldstreicher, Lee, and Glass |
2014-04-05 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2014-04-05 | House | House Refuses to Recede |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senators Gladden, Stone, and Forehand |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2014-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {102819/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2014-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-05 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {958070/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |