MD SB51 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Commission on African American History and Culture to provide operational funding to a museum that specializes in African American history and culture.
Title
Commission on African American History and Culture - Duties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2015-04-11 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-11 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-11 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {304837/1 Report Adopted |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Appropriations
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Committees and Commissions
Historical Matters
Museums
State Aid
State Government - Procurement
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Committees and Commissions
Historical Matters
Museums
State Aid
State Government - Procurement