MD SB509 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each community college to employ a veterans advisor to provide comprehensive enrollment and advising services to current and prospective students who are veterans; and requiring each community college to establish a veterans resource center on the campus for certain purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Colleges - Veterans Advisors and Veterans Resource Centers - Established

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HouseHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-01HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2018-02-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-02-26SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {344235/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-23SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-14SenateHearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
2018-01-29SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback