MD SB507 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-09 - Special Order later today (Delegate Davis) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-09 - Special Order later today (Delegate Davis) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the Injured Workers' Insurance Fund as the Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company; providing that employees are not subject to specified laws, regulations, or executive orders governing State compensation; providing that the Company is the successor of the Fund; authorizing the Company to trade under the name of the Fund until October 1, 2011; etc.
Title
Injured Workers' Insurance Fund - Status, Renaming, and Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-09 | Special Order later today (Delegate Davis) Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-04-12 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-04-12 | Re-referred Economic Matters | |
2010-04-06 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (44-1) | |
2010-04-06 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-03 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Annotated Code of Maryland
Budget and Management, Department of
Debt Collection
Insurance
Insurance Administration
Legislative Services, Department of
Liability
Names
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Prices
Reports
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries
State Employees
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers` Compensation
Budget and Management, Department of
Debt Collection
Insurance
Insurance Administration
Legislative Services, Department of
Liability
Names
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Prices
Reports
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries
State Employees
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers` Compensation