MD SB5 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB71
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 745
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 745
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a person who is the victim of an act that would constitute a violation of certain hate crime laws may bring a civil action against the person or persons who committed the act in a court of competent jurisdiction; and authorizing the court to impose an injunction and award certain economic and noneconomic damages.
Title
Hate Crimes – Civil Remedy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 745 |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (106-31) |
2023-04-03 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2023-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB13 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 744
SB71 (Carry Over) 2022-04-11 - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Carter) Adopted
SB71 (Carry Over) 2022-04-11 - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Carter) Adopted
Subjects
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Court Costs
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Damages
Discrimination
Victims
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Court Costs
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Damages
Discrimination
Victims
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 10 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |