MD SB499 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting members of the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County from serving more than four consecutive terms; extending the term of a certain member of the Board; and authorizing the Board to issue a commercial bingo license to the owner of a licensed commercial bingo establishment.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners Term Limits and Commercial Bingo License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {963125/1 Adopted |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Anne Arundel County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Public Officials
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Anne Arundel County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Public Officials
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 1002.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |