MD SB498 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-25 - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-25 - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the calculation of a certain credit against the State income tax for certain residents who are at least 65 years old; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2023.
Title
Income Tax - Senior Tax Credit - Alterations
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Gile [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB369 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-18 - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 754 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0498?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb0498f.pdf |