MD SB494 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-24 - Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-24 - Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to require for-hire water carriers to show specified proof that the for-hire water carrier holds a specified insurance policy or bond in accordance with a specified regulation before vessel registration; altering the definition of common carrier to exclude for-hire water carriers from regulation by the Public Service Commission; etc.
Title
Department of Natural Resources - Regulation of For-Hire Water Carriers
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-08 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2010-03-05 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-02 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-03 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Boats and Ships
Bonds
For-Hire Driving
Insurance
Natural Resources, Department of
Public Service Commission
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Tourism
Bonds
For-Hire Driving
Insurance
Natural Resources, Department of
Public Service Commission
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Tourism