MD SB492 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each county board of education to develop and operate a single searchable Web site that is accessible to the public and includes annual school budget data; etc.
Title
Education - County School Board Budgets - Transparency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2011-03-02 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) | |
2011-03-02 | Hearing cancelled (Budget and Taxation) | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Budget and Taxation & Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Budgets
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Electronic Government
Local Government Mandates
Public Information
Public Schools
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Electronic Government
Local Government Mandates
Public Information
Public Schools
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/SB0492.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/sb/sb0492f.pdf |