MD SB491 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-05 - Recommit to Committee Ways and Means (Turner F)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the owner of the Bowie Race Course Training Center to convey the property associated with the training center to the State, Prince George's County, or the City of Bowie; and providing for the construction of specified provisions of law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Horse Racing - Bowie Race Course Training Center - Ownership Transfer

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-05 Recommit to Committee Ways and Means (Turner F)
2011-04-03 Special Order until 4/8 (Turner F) Adopted
2011-04-02 Second Reading Passed
2011-04-02 Favorable Report Adopted
2011-04-06 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
2011-03-30 Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-03-24 First Reading Ways and Means
2011-03-25 Third Reading Passed (46-0)
2011-03-23 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2011-03-23 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2011-03-22 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2011-02-09 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-02-04 First Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback