MD SB490 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from using a scanning device to scan or swipe an individual's identification card or a driver's license to obtain personal information; prohibiting a person from retaining, selling, or transferring any information collected from scanning or swiping an individual's identification card or driver's license; providing that nothing in the Act prohibits a law enforcement officer from using a scanning device to record, retain, or transmit information if acting within the scope of the officer's official duties; etc.
Title
Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Floor Amendment {783228/2 (Senator Kagan) Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Kagan) Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Kagan) Adopted |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {657075/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Drivers' Licenses
Electronic Communication
Fraud
Identification
Law Enforcement
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Records
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Unfair Trade Practices
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Drivers' Licenses
Electronic Communication
Fraud
Identification
Law Enforcement
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Records
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Unfair Trade Practices