MD SB490 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a court to provide the Secretary of Health with identifying information regarding an individual who has been convicted under certain provisions of law of the murder, attempted murder, or manslaughter of a child; requiring the Department of Human Services, in coordination with the Vital Statistics Administration, to contract with an independent organization to develop a data collection process in order to assess the effectiveness of certain required record sharing in predicting and preventing child abuse and neglect; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying Information

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 497
2018-04-09SenatePassed Enrolled
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-04-09SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2018-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
2018-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {822817/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2018-03-28HouseHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-26HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2018-02-23SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-02-21SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-21SenateFavorable with Amendments {328273/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-19SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-02-08SenateHearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-29SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0490&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0490f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0490t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0490e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_497_sb0490e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0490_32827301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0490_82281701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0000/sb0490.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0490_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0330.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0490_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1319.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1385.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback