MD SB49 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-06 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-06 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Queen Anne's County Board of License Commissioners to issue a specified number of Beer and Wine Festival (BWF) licenses in the county each year; authorizing the Board to select a specified number of weekends each year for a specified festival; and requiring the Board to choose a specified location for a specified festival and to ensure that the primary focus of a specified festival is the promotion of Maryland beer and wine.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Queen Anne's County - Beer and Wine Festivals
Sponsors
Sen. E.J. Pipkin [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2013-02-28 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2012-11-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
License Commissioners, Boards of
Queen Anne's County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
License Commissioners, Boards of
Queen Anne's County