MD SB488 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-09 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (128-6)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-09 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (128-6)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring in Baltimore City applicants for and holders of Class B-D-7 alcoholic beverages licenses to develop a specified security plan for their premises and submit the plan for review by the Board of Liquor License Commissioners for Baltimore City; authorizing the Board to take specified actions regarding the issuance or renewal of a license; requiring license holders to implement and follow specified security plans; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 License Holders - Security
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Verna Jones-Rodwell [D] | Sen. Nathaniel McFadden [D] |
Sen. Catherine Pugh [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-09 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (128-6) | |
2011-04-08 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-08 | Floor Amendment (Delegate McHale) Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-11 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-03-30 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-27 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2011-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing 3/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Baltimore City
Hearings
Law Enforcement
License Commissioners, Boards of
Local Government Mandates
Minors
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Baltimore City
Hearings
Law Enforcement
License Commissioners, Boards of
Local Government Mandates
Minors
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Rules and Regulations
Safety