MD SB486 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the number of years of service from 16 to 24 that may be used as a multiplier in a formula to determine the pension provided an Orphans' Court judge in Allegany County; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Title
Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension Formula
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-03-26 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2018-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-23 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-23 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-05 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {718477/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Madaleno) Adopted |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {718477/1 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Allegany County
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Estates and Trusts
Judges
Orphans' Court
Retirement Systems
Salaries and Compensation
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Estates and Trusts
Judges
Orphans' Court
Retirement Systems
Salaries and Compensation