MD SB484 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing an individual or corporation a $1 credit against the State income tax for each bushel of oyster shells recycled during the taxable year; providing that the credit may not exceed $750 during a taxable year; requiring the Department of Natural Resources and the Comptroller jointly to adopt regulations to authorize businesses, landfills, and nonprofit organizations to verify the amount of oyster shells recycled by each individual or corporation; etc.
Title
Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2013-04-08 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-08 | House | Delegates Barve, Branch, and Afzali |
2013-04-08 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2013-04-08 | House | House Refuses to Recede |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senators Colburn, Robey, and Madaleno |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2013-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0) |
2013-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {245467/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2013-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-12 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Corporations
Income Tax
Natural Resources, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Oysters
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Comptroller
Corporations
Income Tax
Natural Resources, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Oysters
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income