MD SB483 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the purpose and use of the Maryland Farms and Families Fund to include grants to nonprofit farmers markets and local nonprofit organizations; authorizing the Department of Agriculture, when awarding grants, to consider a nonprofit organization's record of providing services in food deserts; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget a $100,000 appropriation to the Fund, which is in addition to, and may not supplant, any funding appropriated to a certain division in the Department; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Farms and Families Fund - Purpose, Use, Funding, and Grant Qualifications - Alterations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-3) (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (137-3)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-03-16HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2019-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {747571/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) and Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
2019-02-05SenateHearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback