MD SB48 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB837

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-20 - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Hearing: Feb 10 @ 1:00 pm Senate Finance Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to coordinate the implementation of advance care planning programs in the State; requiring each health insurance carrier to offer electronic advance directives to its members and enrollees at certain times and make arrangements to receive certain notifications; and authorizing a health insurance carrier to contract with an electronic advance directives service under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health - Advance Care Planning and Advance Directives

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-20SenateHearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2022-01-12SenateFirst Reading Finance
2021-10-29SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB14 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-12 - Hearing canceled
SB837 (Carry Over) 2021-03-29 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General19145(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15122.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback