MD SB48 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified health insurance carriers, under specified circumstances, to make available during a specified time period Medicare supplement policy plans A and C to individuals who are under the age of 65 years but are eligible for Medicare due to a disability; and repealing an obsolete provision of law relating to open enrollment in specified Medicare supplement policy plans for individuals terminated from the Maryland Health Insurance Plan.
Title
Health Insurance - Medicare Supplement Policies for Dual Eligible Individuals - Open Enrollment Period
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Hearing 1/12 at 1:30 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-09-22 | Senate | Pre-filed |