MD SB48 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-20 - Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-20 - Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to change the qualifications for judges of the Orphans' Court for Baltimore County; requiring judges of the Orphans' Court for Baltimore County to have been admitted to practice law in the State and be members in good standing of the Maryland Bar; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection.
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Qualifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 105 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-20 | Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to | |
2012-03-28 | Third Reading Passed (105-30) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2012-03-30 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-03-21 | Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-16 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2012-03-27 | Returned Passed | |
2012-02-17 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-02-15 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-15 | Favorable with Amendments 978474/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-02-14 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-01-18 | Hearing 2/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-13 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |