MD SB479 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, to the extent practicable, that the Board for the Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company reflect the geographic and demographic, including race and gender, diversity of the State, and that at least one member shall have significant experience in the accounting or auditing field; etc.
Title
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company - Board Structure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2014-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0) |
2014-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {733691/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2014-02-26 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {287571/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Governor
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Prices
Public Employees
Reports
State Employees
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Committees and Commissions
Governor
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Prices
Public Employees
Reports
State Employees
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation