MD SB476 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Legislative Services, in consultation with the State Board of Elections and the Maryland Association of Election Officials, to study the requirements to implement voting by mail; requiring a certain analysis to include information on the administrative, technological, legal, security, and fiscal requirements to implement voting by mail; requiring the Department to report to the General Assembly on or before a December 1, 2019; etc.
Title
Department of Legislative Services - Voting by Mail - Study
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Legislative Services, Department of
Postal Service
Reports
State Government - General Assembly
Voting
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Legislative Services, Department of
Postal Service
Reports
State Government - General Assembly
Voting