MD SB476 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a person who, in good faith, seeks, provides, or assists with medical assistance for a person experiencing a medical emergency after ingesting or using alcohol or drugs, or the person is experiencing the medical emergency after ingesting or using alcohol or drugs, shall be immune from specified criminal prosecutions if evidence for the criminal prosecutions was obtained solely as a result of specified actions; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Limited Immunity - Alcohol- or Drug-Related Medical Emergencies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {548473/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Arrests
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Evidence
Good Samaritan
Identification
Liability
Minors
Substance Abuse
Arrests
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Evidence
Good Samaritan
Identification
Liability
Minors
Substance Abuse