MD SB476 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Financial Education and Capability Commission; providing for the composition, co-chairs, and staffing of the Commission; prohibiting a member of the Commission from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Commission to meet at least two times each year; requiring the Commission to monitor the implementation of specified public and private initiatives and make specified recommendations; etc.
Title
State Government - Financial Education and Capability Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (125-6) | |
2012-04-02 | House Recede | |
2012-04-02 | Motion Recede (Delegate Hixson) Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (123-12) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments 425966/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-03-23 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) | |
2012-03-13 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2012-04-02 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-30 | Senate Requests House Recede | |
2012-03-30 | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments | |
2012-03-12 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-08 | Favorable with Amendments 124538/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/15 at 2:00 p.m. (Education Health and Environmental Affairs) | |
2012-02-02 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs & Finance |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Education
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Reports
Consumer Protection
Education
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Reports