MD SB474 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of County Commissioners of Garrett County to extend, by ordinance or resolution, the availability of a specified property tax credit available under a specified enterprise zone program for an additional 10 years.
Title
Garrett County - Enterprise Zone Property Tax Credit - Extension
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
County Commissioners
Economic and Community Development
Enterprise Zones
Garrett County
Laws and Ordinances
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Economic and Community Development
Enterprise Zones
Garrett County
Laws and Ordinances
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0474?ys=2014rs |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/sb/sb0474f.pdf |