MD SB472 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 559
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 559
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the council of unit owners or other governing body of a condominium association to submit the adopted annual budget to the unit owners not more than 30 days after the meeting at which the budget was adopted; authorizing the adopted annual budget to be submitted to each unit owner by electronic transmission, by posting on the condominium association's home page, or by inclusion in the homeowners association's newsletter; etc.
Title
Condominium Associations and Homeowners Associations – Adopted Annual Budget – Submission to Unit Owners and Lot Owners
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 559 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-3) |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-26 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {128079/1 Adopted |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Condominiums
Electronic Communication
Homeowners Associations
internet
Notices
Publications
Real Property
Residential Property
Revenue and Taxes
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Condominiums
Electronic Communication
Homeowners Associations
internet
Notices
Publications
Real Property
Residential Property
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 11 | 109.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 11B | 112.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |