MD SB472 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a court order that terminates a dormant mineral interest to identify specified information; and requiring a clerk of the court that issued the order to record the order in the land records.
Title
Environment - Dormant Mineral Interests - Termination by Court Order
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-19 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters) | |
2012-03-15 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-14 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-13 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-12 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education Health and Environmental Affairs) | |
2012-02-02 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs & Judicial Proceedings |