MD SB471 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering specified provisions of law relating to the collection, deposit, and purpose of specified fees and revenues related to debt settlement services; repealing the termination date of the Maryland Debt Settlement Services Act; etc.
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Fund and Sunset Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2016-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-24 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Assessments
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Debt Collection
Examinations
Fees
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Fines
Penalties and Sentences
Registration
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Debt Collection
Examinations
Fees
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Fines
Penalties and Sentences
Registration
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset