MD SB470 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Hearing: Feb 25 @ 11:00 am Senate Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain county boards of education to collect and track certain data relating to pregnant, expecting, and parenting students and submit certain data to the Institute for Innovation and Implementation in the University of Maryland School of Social Work on or before July 1, 2022, and each June 1 thereafter; requiring the Institute to document and analyze certain data and to use certain information to develop recommendations on legislation, regulations, and policy initiatives needed to address certain issues; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Institute for Innovation and Implementation - Pregnant, Expecting, and Parenting Students - Data Collection and Report

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10SenateHearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-20SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB439 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-21 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education4138(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback