MD SB470 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Reilly)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Reilly)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the prohibition against a surety insurer inquiring about specified information in connection with an application for a bail bond or an immigration bond.
Title
Surety Insurance - Application for Bonds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | Senate | Recommitted to Finance (Senator Reilly) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Favorable |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Favorable |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Ramirez) Adopted |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Ramirez) Adopted |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Favorable |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |