MD SB47 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-11 - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-11 - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each nursing home and assisted living program to establish certain policies and procedures authorizing indoor visitation from an essential caregiver and relating to the designation and use of an essential caregiver; authorizing nursing homes and assisted living programs to consult with a certain local health officer when establishing certain policies and procedures; requiring an essential caregiver to inform the staff of the nursing home or assisted living program if the essential caregiver develops certain symptoms; etc.
Title
Health Facilities – Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs – Essential Caregivers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2020-10-17 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB806 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-05 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Assisted Living
Boundaries
Caregivers
Communications
Essential Workers
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Nursing Homes
Patients
Public Officials
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Time
Transportation
Boundaries
Caregivers
Communications
Essential Workers
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Nursing Homes
Patients
Public Officials
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Time
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 1401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 1418 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 1801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0047?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0047f.pdf |