MD SB468 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a landlord that requires a tenant to make payments for water or sewer utility services to the landlord to use a written lease that includes a notice that the tenant is responsible for making payments for water or sewer utility services to the landlord and to provide a copy of a certain water or sewer bill to a tenant; and providing for the application of the Act.
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Water and Sewer Bills
Sponsors
Sen. Adelaide Eckardt [R] | Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Stephen Hershey [R] | Sen. Johnny Salling [R] |
Sen. William Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (38-9) (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (38-9) (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-28 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-27 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (38-9) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {708975/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |