MD SB460 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the maximum fine from $500 to $1,000 that may be imposed for a violation of provisions of the Maryland Vehicle Law regarding crosswalks; establishing the Pedestrian Safety Fund for the purpose of enhancing the safety and quality of pedestrian and bicycle transportation, including through certain educational programming for bicyclists, motorists, and pedestrians, certain physical design changes, and certain increased enforcement of existing rules of the road; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pedestrian Safety Fund Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (120-14) (Y: 120 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (119-17) (Y: 119 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 519
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (120-14)
2019-04-08HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-06HouseDelegates Stein, Stewart, and Ciliberti
2019-04-06HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-06HouseHouse Refuses to Recede
2019-04-05SenateSenators Waldstreicher, Washington, and West
2019-04-05SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-05SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2019-04-05SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (119-17)
2019-03-27HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-27HouseFavorable with Amendments {540811/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-27HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-26HouseHearing canceled
2019-03-18HouseHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-13SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0460&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0460f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0460t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0460e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_519_sb0460e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0460_54081101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0460_94332901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0460_18302601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0000/sb0460.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0460_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0556.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0460_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1013.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0460_18302601.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1570.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1401.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback