MD SB460 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Veto sustained (0-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Veto sustained (0-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a 2-year period of time during which a county government is not required to reimburse the State for outstanding debt service for specified school buildings that are transferred to a county government; and requiring a county government to reimburse the State for a specified amount of outstanding debt service for specified school buildings after the 2-year period of time has elapsed.
Title
Education - Debt Service for Transferred Schools - County Reimbursement Grace Period
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Senate | Veto sustained (0-44) |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2017-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-16 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Counties
Debt Management
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Time
Debt Management
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Time