MD SB46 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB554

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-28 - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that the discovery or perception of, or belief about, another person's race, color, national origin, sex, gender identity, or sexual orientation, whether or not accurate, does not constitute legally adequate provocation to mitigate a killing from the crime of murder to manslaughter or an assault from the crime of assault in the first degree to assault in the second degree or another lesser crime.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes - Mitigation - Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-28SenateHearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
2020-08-04SenatePre-filed
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB231 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
SB554 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback