MD SB46 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to require that a boating safety education course include information relating to carbon monoxide poisoning; requiring the Department to develop an informational brochure on the dangers of carbon monoxide poisoning while boating and while in an enclosed occupancy compartment; requiring the Department to report to the General Assembly by December 1, 2018, on the prevention of carbon monoxide poisoning relating to motorboat operation; etc.
Title
Natural Resources – State Boat Act – Carbon Monoxide Safety
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Floor Amendment {873827/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Motion Return Second Reading (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Floor Amendment {363626/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Motion Return Second Reading (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {984535/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-11-06 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Boats and Ships
Education
Equipment
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Retail Sales
Safety
Water
Education
Equipment
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Retail Sales
Safety
Water